Allison v. Digital Management Incorporation

Plaintiff: James Allison
Defendant: Digital Management Incorporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00760
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/3/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/26/13. (cbssec)
September 10, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/10/13. ORDERED that parties MUST fully comply with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2, specifically those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal. (cbssec)
October 31, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting without prejudice 21 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/31/13. This case is dismissed.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allison v. Digital Management Incorporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Management Incorporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]