Hall v. Daniels

Petitioner: Marc Pierre Hall
Respondent: C. Daniels
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00773
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion Adopting Attachments, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/17/13.(nmmsl, ) Modified on 4/17/2013 to add the word 'MINUTE' (bnbcd, ).
April 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause: Mr. Hall show cause in writing within 30 days from the date of this order why the habeas corpus application should not be denied for the reasons stated in this order. ORDER denying 5 Affidaivt and Motion for the Court to Take Judicial Notice of Falsified Records of Adjudicated Facts, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/2013.(skl)
June 27, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 1 habeas corpus application is denied and the action is dismissed for the reasons stated in this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/27/2013. (ervsl, )
March 26, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/26/2013. (skl)
April 5, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's objection 7 is overruled. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to cure the deficiency if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/5/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hall v. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marc Pierre Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]