Aurora Bank FSB v. Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc.

Defendant: Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aurora Bank FSB
Case Number: 1:2013cv00781
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 17 the Joint Motion and Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order for Confidential Disclosure of Discovery Materials, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/19/2013. (mehcd)
July 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CONFIDENTIAL DISCLOSURE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/19/2013. (mehcd)
September 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Initial expert designation: October 7, 2013. Rebuttal expert designation: November 4, 2013. Discovery cutoff: December 1, 2013. Dispositive motions deadline: December 30, 2013. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/6/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/30/2013.(trlee, )
February 19, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 28 The third Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2014. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/21/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/19/2014. (mehcd)
June 5, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each of the parties to bear their own fees and costs incurred in this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/5/2014. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aurora Bank FSB v. Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Bank FSB
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Carrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]