SG Interests VII, Ltd. et al v. Bear Ranch LLC

Plaintiff: SG Interests VII, Ltd. and SG Interests I, Ltd.
Defendant: Bear Ranch LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00787
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/9/2013. (mjwcd)
May 28, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/25/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/2/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Bench Trial set for 5/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/13. (rebsec, )
June 12, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Permission to File and for the Court to Consider, the Within Sur-Reply. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/12/2013. (klyon, )
August 13, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice [#35] filed August 13, 2013, is APPROVED. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set May 2, 2014, are VACATED. The trial to the court set to commence May 5, 2014, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/13/2013. (cmacd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SG Interests VII, Ltd. et al v. Bear Ranch LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SG Interests VII, Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn Haight
Represented By: Samuel Sage Bacon
Represented By: Joseph C. Pierzchala
Represented By: Brian S. Tooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SG Interests I, Ltd.
Represented By: Samuel Sage Bacon
Represented By: Kathryn Haight
Represented By: Joseph C. Pierzchala
Represented By: Brian S. Tooley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Ranch LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Beyer
Represented By: Kathryn Reed DeBord
Represented By: Sarah Levine Hartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]