Wardcraft Homes, Inc. v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Wardcraft Homes, Inc.
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00789
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 21 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Rulings on Dispositive Motions Regarding the Duty to Defend. All discovery is STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [# 17 ]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/11/2013.(klyon, )
May 27, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/27/14. Joint Motion to Vacate Pre-Trial Conference 34 is GRANTED. The Final Pretrial Conference set for June 2, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. (lgale)
September 29, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Docket No. 17] is DENIED. ORDERED that defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 24] is GRANTED. ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendant may have its costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/29/14.(jhawk, )
September 30, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 24] is GRANTED. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendant Employers Mutual Casualty Company and against plaintiff Wardcraft Homes, Inc. ORDERED that defendant is AWARDED its costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Clerk on 09/30/14. (jhawk, )
April 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/18/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wardcraft Homes, Inc. v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wardcraft Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]