Keeney v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Day Keeney
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00796
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/19/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on June 13, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/6/2013. (rpmcd )
February 13, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. Granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
February 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 16 : Defendant's motion for summary judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/18/2014. (rpmcd)
February 18, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re 23 : judgment is entered for the defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company, and against the plaintiff, Michael Day Keeney. This civil action is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant is awarded costs upon the filing of a bill of costs within 14 days, by Deputy Clerk on 2/18/2014. (rpmcd)
May 9, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REVIEW OF AWARD OF COSTS re 35 : the award of costs by the Clerk is revised to exclude the amounts awarded for expert witnesses, making the award $65.00, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/9/2014 re 34 .(jsmit )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keeney v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Day Keeney
Represented By: Todd Frank Bovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.