Ellis v. First National Collection Bureau, Inc.

Plaintiff: Carla Ellis
Defendant: First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00808
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 10 the Unopposed Motion for Leave to Attend the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Telephonically of Defendant First National Collection Bureau,Inc., by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/22/2013.(ervsl, )
June 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice, with each party to pay her or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/11/2013. (ervsl, )
April 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 5/28/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ellis v. First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Ellis
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Bedell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]