Jackson National Life Insurance Company v. Kipper-Tomke et al

Defendant: Kristina N. Kipper-Tomke, Karen Kipper-Tomke and Katie Kathleen Krumm
Plaintiff: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00810
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 62 , 64 Stipulation for Release of Interpleader Funds Held In the Registry of the Court. The Clerk of the Court shall release and pay to the District Court of Routt County, Colorado, the funds held in the registry of the court in this interpleader action. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/7/13. (mnfsl, ) Modified on 11/7/2013 to correct linkage (mnfsl, ).
November 7, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 47 Defendant Katie Kathleen Krumm's Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/7/13.(mnfsl, )
November 8, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 65 ORDER re: 62 , 64 Stipulation for Release of Interpleader Funds Held In the Registry of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to release and pay to the District Court of Routt County, Colorado, all funds, including interest, held in the registry in connection with this action. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/8/13. (mnfsl, )
December 30, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Defendant Katie Kathleen Krumm's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.3. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/30/13.(mnfsl, )
April 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/13/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson National Life Insurance Company v. Kipper-Tomke et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina N. Kipper-Tomke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Kipper-Tomke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Kathleen Krumm
Represented By: Marcie Rae McMinimee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William James Garehime, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]