Connelly v. Vail Land Corp et al

Plaintiff: Maureen Connelly
Defendant: Vail Land Corp, Garfinkel's Inc, Garfinkel Enterprises, Ltd. and Garfinkel's Restaurant and Bar
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00816
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16, it is ORDERED that a scheduling conference will be held on October 1, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 26, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/6/2013. (ervsl, )
September 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S NEGLIGENCE CLAIM, against defendant Garfinkel Enterprises, LTD., d/b/a Garfinkel's Restaurant and Bar, and each party to pay his or her or its own costs and attorney's fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/3/2013.(rpmcd)
February 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending Scheduling Order. Upon review of the stipulated motion to amend the Scheduling Order 21 , it is ORDERED that the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Discovery Cut-Off: May 2, 2014; Burden of Persuasion Expert Disclosures: March 24, 2014; Contradicting Expert Disclosures: April 24, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2014.(evana, )
March 25, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Amend re 18 : deadline is extended to and including May 1, 2014, for plaintiff to submit her expert witnesses pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2) on the issues of liability, and deadline is extended to and including May 16, 2014, for the defendant to submit expert witnesses pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/25/2014.(jsmit )
May 5, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 25 Motion for Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/5/2014.(jsmit )
May 15, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Amend re 18 : to and including June 13, 2014, for the Defendant to submit expert witnesses, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/15/2014.(jsmit)
June 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 7/31/2014 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 7/24/2014 in paper form directly to chambers, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/11/2014. (jsmit )
July 31, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 1/12/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/19/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/31/2014. (jsmit )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Connelly v. Vail Land Corp et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Connelly
Represented By: Gregory A. Gold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Land Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfinkel's Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfinkel Enterprises, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfinkel's Restaurant and Bar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]