Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Dugout, LLC, The

Defendant: Dugout, LLC, The
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00821
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605 Cable Comm:Unauthorized publication or use of comm
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/23/13. This action is remanded to the District Court, Weld County, Colorado.(dkals, )
November 12, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 First Motion to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/12/13.(dkals, )
April 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 5/9/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/9/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Dugout, LLC, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugout, LLC, The
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Owen Stapel
Represented By: Jacques Serge Ruda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]