Garcia v. Landreth et al.

Defendant: Irene Basta, Evan Garcia, Cindy Gomez, Ryan Landreth, Bryan Koncijila, Anna Guagliardo and Jason Ragan
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Case Number: 1:2013cv00843
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTEORDER granting 15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order. The written Stipulation and Protective Order (15-1) is approved as amended in paragraph 14 and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/6/2013.(mjwcd)
June 6, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/6/2013. (mjwcd)
October 7, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/7/13.(dkals, )
November 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 the Parties Stipultated Motion to Dismiss Defendants Pursuant to Rule 41(a); (1) Party Anna Guagliardo (in her individual capacity), Bryan Koncijila (in his individual capacity), Jason Ragan (in his individual capacity), Irene Basta (in her individual capacity) and Evan Garcia (in his individual capacity) are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/19/2013.(ervsl, )
April 3, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/3/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Landreth et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Basta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Landreth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Koncijila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Guagliardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ragan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Garcia
Represented By: Jennifer W. Stock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]