Gonzales v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Rosalinda Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2013cv00847
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/3/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/3/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 10/18/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/23/13. (mnfsl, )
November 14, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/14/13.(mnfsl, )
November 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 20 Order. By Clerk on 11/15/13. (mnfsl, )
February 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Stipulated (Motion for) Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. By Judge John L. Kane on 2/5/2014.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalinda Gonzales
Represented By: Rachael Adair Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.