Slavnic v. CH2M Hill Academy Services

Plaintiff: Amanda Slavnic
Defendant: CH2M Hill Academy Services
Case Number: 1:2013cv00857
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/30/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 6/4/2014 08:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/22/13. (rebsec, )
December 17, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. The Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice [# 25 ] is GRANTED. The Defendant CH2M Hill Academy Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint [# 10 ] and the Recommendation of UnitedStates Magistrate J udge [# 24 ] are DENIED as moot. The combined Trial Preparation Conference and Final Pretrial Conference set 5/30/2014, and the trial by jury set to commence 6/9/2014, are VACATED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice with the parties to bear their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2013. (klyon, )
April 4, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klmcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slavnic v. CH2M Hill Academy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Slavnic
Represented By: Elwyn F. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH2M Hill Academy Services
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Christoff
Represented By: Meghan W. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.