Ramirez et al v. El Tapatio, Inc. et al

Defendant: El Tapatio, Inc., El Tapatio Mississippi, Inc., El Tapatio Arapahoe, Inc., Rodrigo Padilla Sr., Estelia Padilla and Aglahe Padilla
Plaintiff: Alberto Ursua, Alejandro Ramirez, Abel Fortanel, Jose Jesus Ibarra, Leslie Lopez and Claudia Ursua
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00861
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 7/15/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/8/13. (bnbcd, )
June 6, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay on Plaintiffs' Motion For Conditional Certification as a Collective Action and For Court- Authorized Notice. Defendants shall have until 7/29/13, in which to file their response to the Plaintiffs' Motion. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/6/13.(mjgsl, )
July 22, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The proposed scheduling order is REFUSED; the parties shall file a joint motion to stay by 8/1/13; Status Report due by 9/2/2013. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/22/13. (bnbcd, )
August 19, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Alternative Dispute Resolution. This action is STAYED to and including 11/1/2013. A scheduling conference is set for 11/12/2013, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom401, 4th floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall prepare a proposed scheduling order and submit it to the court on or before 11/5/2013. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/19/2013.(klyon, )
October 31, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the 44 Status Report, the parties shall file a Joint Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement by 11/14/14. The Scheduling Conference is VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/31/13. (bnbcd, )
February 12, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Collective and Fed.R.Civ.P.23(e) Class Action Settlement. A one hour fairness hearing to consider final approval of the proposed settlement shall be held on Friday, June 13, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1001A, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse Annex, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The court shall consider Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees [# 51 ], filed November 27, 2013, in conjunction with its consideration of the fairness of thesettlement at the fairness hearing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/12/2014.(klyon, )
June 16, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 58 Order on Motion to Certify Class, by Clerk on 6/16/2014. (klyon, )
April 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. El Tapatio, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Tapatio, Inc.
Represented By: Vance Orlando Knapp
Represented By: Karla Edith Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Tapatio Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By: Vance Orlando Knapp
Represented By: Karla Edith Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Tapatio Arapahoe, Inc.
Represented By: Vance Orlando Knapp
Represented By: Karla Edith Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrigo Padilla Sr.
Represented By: Vance Orlando Knapp
Represented By: Karla Edith Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estelia Padilla
Represented By: Vance Orlando Knapp
Represented By: Karla Edith Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aglahe Padilla
Represented By: Vance Orlando Knapp
Represented By: Karla Edith Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Ursua
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramirez
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Fortanel
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jesus Ibarra
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Lopez
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Ursua
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]