Viaero Wireless v. Nokia Siemens Networks US LLC

Plaintiff: Viaero Wireless
Defendant: Nokia Siemens Networks US LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00866
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 6/25/2013. 18 Motion and Brief to Stay Discovery is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is denied to the extent th at the motion seeks to stay all discovery. The parties are allowed to conduct discovery exercising requests for production and initial disclosures. A Motion Hearing regarding 17 Motion and Brief to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay This Proceeding is set for 7/24/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi, )
July 24, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2013. The court advises that it will take under advisement Defendant's 17 Motion and Brief to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay This Proceeding. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
August 21, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Caption and Docket. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the case caption and docket to reflect Defendant's new legally registered name, Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 08/21/13. (alvsl)
September 25, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Nokia Solutions Network US LLC's 17 Motion to Compel Arbitration and To Dismiss or Stay This Proceeding, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/25/13.(cbssec)
April 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 6/25/2013 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/9/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Viaero Wireless v. Nokia Siemens Networks US LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viaero Wireless
Represented By: Christian Heath Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Siemens Networks US LLC
Represented By: Steven Keith Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]