Safehouse Progressive Alliance for Nonviolence, Inc. et al v. Alliance of Nonprofits for Insurance, Risk Retention Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Anne Tapp and Safehouse Progressive Alliance for Nonviolence, Inc.
Defendant: Alliance of Nonprofits for Insurance, Risk Retention Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00868
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint docket no. 13 is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the subject motion docket no. 13 and in the interest of justice as outlined in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). The A mended Complaint docket no. 14 is accepted for filing as of the date of this minute order, the deadline to complete discovery is February 14, 2014; the deadline to file dispositive motions is March 14, 2014; and the Final Pretrial Conference is set on May 21, 2014.Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (mjwcd) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/22/2013) (ervsl, ). (Modified on 10/22/2013 Replaced corrected PDF and edited the text to the Correct PDF)(ervsl, ). (ervsl, ).
February 3, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 12 is amended. Fact Discovery due by 4/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/2014. Final Pretrial Conference 5/21/2014 09:00 AM is vacated. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/3/2014.(mjwcd)
April 29, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 the Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order for Extension of Deadlines; Discovery due by 8/29/2014; Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/29/2014.(evana, )
May 21, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order. The written Stipulated Protective Order (30-1) is approved as amended in paragraph 15 and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/21/2014.(emill)
May 21, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/21/2014. (emill)
June 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2013 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/20/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Safehouse Progressive Alliance for Nonviolence, Inc. et al v. Alliance of Nonprofits for Insurance, Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Tapp
Represented By: Cyd Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safehouse Progressive Alliance for Nonviolence, Inc.
Represented By: Cyd Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance of Nonprofits for Insurance, Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffaney A. Norton
Represented By: Geoffrey George Frazier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]