Stonemets v. Sawaya, Rose, McClure & Wilhite, P.C.

Plaintiff: Cindy Stonemets
Defendant: Sawaya, Rose, McClure & Wilhite, P.C.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00874
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE; This matter has been scheduled for a three-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on March 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 6, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/08/2013. (rbjsec. )
November 5, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/5/2013. (trlee, )
April 15, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/15/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stonemets v. Sawaya, Rose, McClure & Wilhite, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Stonemets
Represented By: Lark H. Fogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawaya, Rose, McClure & Wilhite, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]