Brilliant Optical Solutions, LLC v. Comcast Corporation

Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Plaintiff: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00886
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Briefing on Markman Issues. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/1/2013. (klyon, )
November 12, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Defendant Comcast Corporation's MotionFor Leave to File a Surreply to Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief(Dkt. 23). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/2013.(klyon, )
November 13, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Markman Hearing for 2/7/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/13/2013. (klyon, )
January 16, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. Ordered that Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is SUBSTITUTED for defendant, Comcast Corporation. Ordered that plaintiff's claims against defendant, Comcast Corporation, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that henceforth Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, SHALL BE NAMED in the caption as the defendant by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/16/14. (jjhsl, )
January 29, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion For Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/29/2014.(klyon, )
January 29, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (klyon, )
February 3, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Markman Hearing. The Markman hearing currently set Friday,February 7, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/3/2014. (klyon, )
February 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Appointment of Special Master. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/18/2014. (klyon, )
April 16, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Unopposed Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice [# 43 ] filed April 16, 2014, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/16/2014. (klyon, )
May 15, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: # 48 (Motion) Restricted Document - Level 1 and # 59 Motion for Attorney Fees, to Declare Case Exceptional and Request for Hearing - Redacted Public Version, are DENIED as moot, due to the filing of # 67 (Motion) Restricted Document - Level 1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/15/2014.(klyon, )
May 1, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/1/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brilliant Optical Solutions, LLC v. Comcast Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC
Represented By: Paul Alan Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]