Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC v. Zayo Group, LLC

Defendant: Zayo Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00887
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a two week jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on January 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for January 5, 2015 at 8:00 a.m. A full-day Markman Hearing has been scheduled for April 17, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 08/13/2013. (rbjsec. )
October 29, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/29/2013.(trlee, )
April 11, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/11/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC v. Zayo Group, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Chevalier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC
Represented By: Paul Alan Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]