Kemper v. Astrue et al

Plaintiff: Gary Allen Kemper
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00889
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Cite Supplemental Authority. The two additional pages submitted with plaintiff's motion are accepted as filed. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/4/13.(mnfsl, )
September 12, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The 25 Motion Factual Account is apparently asking about benifits "granted" in a 9/4/2013 Minute Order. No ruling whatsoever has been made in this case, and will not be made until the defendant has an opportunity to respond (response due on 9/23/2013),and Mr. Kemper has had an opportunity to reply (reply due on 10/8/2013). The 25 motion is denied as moot. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/12/13.(mnfsl, )
July 18, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/18/14. (jdyne, )
April 8, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/08/13. (nmmsl, )
April 17, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. ORDERED that this case shall be placed on the AP docket. Carolyn W. Colvin became acting Commissioner of Social Security on February 14, 2013. Therefore, she is substituted for Michael J. Astrue as the named defendant. Carolyn W. Colvin is the only properly named defendant in this action, see 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), and the remaining defendants shall be removed from the Docket, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kemper v. Astrue et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Allen Kemper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]