Plumb v. Neil et al

Defendant: Thomas P. Neil and Red Eagle Oil, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald D. Plumb
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00890
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 29 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/2013.(ervsl, )
December 17, 2013 32 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2013. 24 Defendants' Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (rbjcd, )
December 30, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER This matter arises on the Defendants Motion to Compel Doc. # 24 , filed 11/27/2013 (the Motion to Compel). I held a hearing on the Motion to Compel on December 17, 2013, and made rulings on the record, which are incorporated here. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Compel Doc. # 24 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as specified on the record, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/30/2013. (ervsl, )
February 25, 2014 35 Featured Case ORDER denying 15 Defendants Early Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/25/2014.(evana, )
June 12, 2014 39 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/14 re: Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Plaintiff's Pretrial Order and Pretrial Conference 37 . The Motion is GRANTED and the Pretrial Conference set forJune 25, 2014, is vacated and reset to August 7, 2014, at 1:30 p.m.(bsimm)
August 13, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 the Parties Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party shall pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs. by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/13/2014.(evana, )
April 12, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 5/30/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Plumb v. Neil et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Neil
Represented By: James M. Dieterich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Eagle Oil, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dieterich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald D. Plumb
Represented By: Robert Dean Wilhite, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]