Draxler v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Roland F. Draxler
Case Number: 1:2013cv00895
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/21/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/20/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/6/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/3/13. (mnfsl, )
October 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 21 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice is granted. The action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorney fees. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/23/13. (mnfsl, )
April 17, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 4/17/13. (sgrim)
April 26, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify by Judge John L. Kane on 4/26/13.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draxler v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland F. Draxler
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]