Garcia v. Sloan, et al

Respondent: Sloan and The Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Petitioner: Jimmy Garcia
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00914
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Bent
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/28/13 To File Pre-Answer Response. ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. (nmmsl, )
August 15, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the habeas corpus application 5 and the amended application 9 are denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/15/13. (sgrim)
August 15, 2013 21 Featured Case JUDGMENT re: 20 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 8/15/13. (sgrim)
April 10, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/10/2013. (skl)
April 24, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Pleading, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/24/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garcia v. Sloan, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]