Oropeza v. Costco Wholesale Corp.

Plaintiff: Oscar Oropeza
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00924
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2615 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal I hereby recuse myself from the above entitled action. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall assign another magistrate judge to this case. FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for July 9, 2013 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/2013. (ervsl, )
June 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/14/2013. (mjwcd)
May 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/9/2013 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/3/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oropeza v. Costco Wholesale Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Oropeza
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: Lindsay Stevens Fitch
Represented By: David Daniel Powell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]