USA v. $393,550.00 In United States Currency

Defendant: $393,550.00 In United States Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Claimant: Seung Yu
Case Number: 1:2013cv00933
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/14/2014. (athom, )
August 22, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Suppress. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/22/2014. (athom, )
February 23, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 36 Motion for Trial; granting 37 Motion for Hearing/Conference. A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/16/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang on 02/23/2015. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $393,550.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $393,550.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: James Sandy Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Seung Yu
Represented By: Ariel Zusya Benjamin
Represented By: Harvey Abe Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.