Giroux v. Heartland Technology Partners, LLC

Plaintiff: Larry Giroux
Defendant: Heartland Technology Partners, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00939
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 31 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/18/13. (alvsl)
October 1, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER: The case is remanded to the District Court for the Ninth Judicial District, Garfield County, Colorado. Civil Case Terminated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/01/13. (alvsl)
April 12, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/12/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Giroux v. Heartland Technology Partners, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Giroux
Represented By: Colin Andrew Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Technology Partners, LLC
Represented By: James Francis Fosnaught
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]