Alliance Construction Solutions of Wyoming, LLC v. International Fidelity Insurance Company

Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alliance Construction Solutions of Wyoming, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00940
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 6/13/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )
April 26, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. This case shall be remanded to the District Court for the City and County of Denver, Colorado, where it was filed as Case No. 2013cv31189. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/26/13. (mnfsl, )
April 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/29/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance Construction Solutions of Wyoming, LLC v. International Fidelity Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Represented By: L. Jay Labe
Represented By: Edgar L. Neel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Construction Solutions of Wyoming, LLC
Represented By: Alvin M. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]