Howard v. Colvin

Plaintiff: James A. Howard
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv00944
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/22/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/21/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/6/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/29/13. (mnfsl, )
April 10, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES: The 25 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Payment of Mr. Howard's attorney fees in the amount of $7,482.09 shall be made to Mr. Howard directly, in care of his attorney. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/10/15.(msksec, )
April 17, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 4/17/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Howard
Represented By: Charles Edward Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.