Berube v. Mike Ensminger, et al

Defendant: Nicklos Pinell and Mike Ensminger
Plaintiff: Kimberly Berube
Case Number: 1:2013cv00950
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Teller
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 8 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/29/2013. (rpmcd )
June 5, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER re 17 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2013. (rpmcd )
June 5, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Party Board of County Commissioner of the County of Teller, Colorado, with prejudice, each party to bear her/its own costs and attorney fees and defendant Board of County Commissioner of the County of Teller, Colorado is removed from the caption of this suit, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2013.(rpmcd)
June 5, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 in all court filings, as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 20 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2013. (rpmcd)
June 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Joint Motion to Adopt Scheduling Order: Joint Motion to Adopt Scheduling Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2013.(rpmcd )
December 4, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Amend SCHEDULING ORDER re 23 DEADLINES: Expert Designations 2/29/14, Rebuttal Expert Designation 4/30/14, Discovery due by 5/29/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2014. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/4/2013.(rpmcd )
January 8, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 34 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings or Alternatively Summary Judgment by the Defendant Sheriff Mike Ensminger re 35 denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/8/2014.(rpmcd )
January 8, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT NIKLOS PINELL re 34 and 44 : this civil action is dismissed as to defendant Nicklos Pinell, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/8/2014. (rpmcd)
February 20, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Amend 23 Scheduling Order: Expert Designations 3/28/14, Contradicting Expert Designations 4/28/14, Rebuttal Expert Designations 5/30/14, Discovery due by 6/27/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/20/2014.(rpmcd )
April 11, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear her or his costs and attorney fees, in full, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/11/2014. (jsmit)
May 10, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 6/18/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/10/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berube v. Mike Ensminger, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicklos Pinell
Represented By: Timothy Peter Schimberg
Represented By: Andrew R. McLetchie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ensminger
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Berube
Represented By: Loye Douglas Jewell
Represented By: Robert Stephen Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]