Hindorff v. GSCRP, Inc.

Defendant: Tri-State Mortgage, LLC, GSCRP, Inc. and Paul M. Weissmann
Plaintiff: John D. Hindorff
Counter_claimant: GSCRP, Inc.
Counter_defendant: John D. Hindorff
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00955
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendant Paul M. Weissmann's Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer. Defendant Paul M. Weissmann may file an amended answer on or before 6/10/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/29/13.(mnfsl, )
June 3, 2013 33 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/3/2013 proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Taking under advisement 7 Motion for TRO. Mr. Hindorff shall file a reply to Plaintiff's Verified Motion for a Temporary Restraining Orde r and Preliminary Injunction [ECF Doc. No. 7] on or before Wednesday, June 5, 2013. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's witness list, # 2 Defendants' witness list, # 3 Defendants' exhibit list). (wydcd, rrk)
June 14, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiff's 7 Verified Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum In Support thereof is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants GSCRP, Inc. and Paul M. Weissmann are hereby enjoined from starting foreclosure proceedings on the real property located at 1826 Faith Place, Longmont, CO 80501. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(d), the injunction will take effect upon plaintiff John D. Hindorff posting a bond of $5400.00 into the court registry as security. This preliminary injunction shall remain in effect until the entry of final judgment in this case. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/14/13.(mnfsl, )
June 24, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference, set for 7/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/24/13. (mjgsl, )
July 19, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2013 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/2/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/19/2013. (klyon, )
November 6, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 53 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The cash bond posted by plaintiff shall be released to plaintiff from the Court Registry, plus interest, less the registry fee assessment. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/6/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hindorff v. GSCRP, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSCRP, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Otto Schroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Weissmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Hindorff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: GSCRP, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Otto Schroeder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John D. Hindorff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]