Wiglesworth v. Pagel et al

Plaintiff: Billy Jack Wiglesworth
Defendant: Christopher Pagel, GEO Group Inc., The and Joe D. Driver
Case Number: 1:2013cv00957
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the action and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/21/13. (dkals, )
June 27, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, or in the alternative a Certificate of Appability [sic]. FURTHER ORDERED that any other pending motions are denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/27/13.(mjgsl, )
February 12, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/12/14. (dkals, )
February 18, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. It is ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/18/14. (smoor, )
June 3, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Transfer Venue, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/3/14.(sgrim)
December 5, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED Defendants Christopher Pagel and The Geo Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dimiss 49 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 55 is DENIED. Within thirty days from the date of this Order Plaintiff m ay file an amended complaint to assert only a claim or claims for negligence per se premised on the alleged violation of a Colorado statute. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this Order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and this Court's Local Rules of Practice, within the time allowed, the court will dismiss this action and enter judgment in favor of the defendants, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/5/14.(sgrim)
April 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/19/13. (nmmsl, )
May 8, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion To Withdraw filed by Max D. Garner and Aaron D. Sperbeck, in representing Defendants Christopher Pagel and The GEO Group, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/08/13.(nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiglesworth v. Pagel et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Jack Wiglesworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Pagel
Represented By: Ann Baumgartner Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group Inc., The
Represented By: Ann Baumgartner Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe D. Driver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]