Elbram Stone, LLC v. United States Forest Service et al

Defendant: United States Forest Service, David Francomb, Scott Fitzwilliams and Daniel Jiron
Plaintiff: Elbram Stone, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00962
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DOC. 8 AS MOOT. The 8 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/23/13.(mnfsl, )
September 18, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Oral Argument proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 9/18/2013. Taking under advisement 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (babia)
September 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/19/13.(mnfsl, )
September 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 25 Order. By Clerk on 9/19/13. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Elbram Stone, LLC v. United States Forest Service et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Juan Gonzalo Villasenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Francomb
Represented By: Juan Gonzalo Villasenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fitzwilliams
Represented By: Juan Gonzalo Villasenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jiron
Represented By: Juan Gonzalo Villasenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbram Stone, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]