Maez, Jr. v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Michael Maez, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00963
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 13 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/4/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/4/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/19/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/26/13. (mnfsl, )
July 23, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER: The Commissioner's final order is affirmed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/23/2014. (eseam)
July 23, 2014 20 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to the 19 Order, by Clerk on 7/23/2014. (eseam)
April 17, 2013 6 Featured Case Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 4/17/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Maez, Jr. v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Maez, Jr.
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]