Smith v. Havard et al

Defendant: Terri Baker, Mr. A's Restaurant and Lounge, Carla Havard and City and County of Denver, Colorado, The
Plaintiff: Kevin Smith
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00969
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 42 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 8/13/2013. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file dismissal paperwork related to Defendants Terri Baker and Mr. A's Restaurant an d Lounge no later than August 27, 2013. 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. 21 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. 24 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order and to Stay Discovery is DENIED AS MOOT. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
December 18, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER Adopting and Affirming 51 Report and Recommendations, and granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/18/13.(dkals, )
April 7, 2014 77 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/07/2014. (cbslc1)
April 23, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/1/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/23/13. (cbssec)
May 22, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Defendant City and County of Denver, Colorado. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/22/2014. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Havard et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. A's Restaurant and Lounge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Havard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Smith
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]