Adams v. Miller

Plaintiff: Cyrus Eugene Adams
Defendant: Jon Miller
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00970
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2014 held before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Compel 12 , is withdrawn. Dismissal papers due by May 15, 2014. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit )
June 18, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014. (jsmit)
July 25, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/12/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on September 5, 2013, and lead counsel present in person. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/25/2013. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adams v. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrus Eugene Adams
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]