Sexton v. Hickenlooper et al

Defendant: Michael Hancock, John Hickenlooper and James Henning
Plaintiff: John Thomas Sexton, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01008
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 8/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/13. (sgrim)
June 27, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 28 Motion to Name Unknown Party. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/27/2013. (klyon, )
October 1, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay. All discovery in this matter is hereby STAYED and the Scheduling Conference will not be reset at this time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within seven days of a ruling on Defendants motions to dismiss, if any portion of the case remains pending, to advise if the Scheduling Conference should be reset. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/1/2013.(trlee, )
March 19, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS: The Court ADOPTS the Recommendation 54 that Defendants Hickenlooper, Hancock, and Henning's Motions to Dismiss 20 , 24 be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. All claims against Defendants Hickenlooper and Hancock, except the First Amendment claim, are dismissed. As to Defendant Henning, no claims are dismissed but for the state law tort claims. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/18/14.(msksec, )
March 26, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling Conference/Planning Meeting for 5/13/2014 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/26/2014. (klyon, )
May 13, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/13/14. (sgrim)
May 13, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/13/14. (msksec, )
May 19, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 76 Motion to Amend Complaint and Name Unknown Officer and Have Him Served with Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/19/14.(sgrim)
April 22, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/22/13. (nmmsl, )
September 3, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Previous Motion to Amend Dated August 15, 2014 89 is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling a motion to amend his complaint to add a request for attorney's fees if and when he obtains counsel to represent him in this action, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/3/14.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sexton v. Hickenlooper et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hancock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hickenlooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Henning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Sexton, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]