DeAnda v. GC Services, L.P.

Plaintiff: Rene DeAnda
Defendant: GC Services, L.P.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01013
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/5/13. (sgrim)
August 22, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/22/14 denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment.Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.(nmarb, )
April 30, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/30/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DeAnda v. GC Services, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene DeAnda
Represented By: Lark H. Fogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services, L.P.
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]