Lanx, Inc. v. Pioneer Surgical Technology, Inc.

Defendant: Pioneer Surgical Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lanx, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01035
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 the Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone and any out-of-state counsel may appear telephonically by calling Chambers at 303-844- 6408 on July 11, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Mountain Daylight Time, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/8/2013.(ervsl, )
October 7, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/7/13. (bnbcd, )
October 7, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding E-Discovery. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/7/13. (bnbcd, )
November 18, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 39 the Stipulated Motion Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(4) to Modify Scheduling Order, Initial Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2013; Opening claim construction briefs due January 10, 2014; Responsive claim construction briefs due February 7, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18.2013.(ervsl, )
June 10, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 the Parties Joint Motion Requesting Order of Dismissal. The above captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay her or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/10/2014.(evana, )
April 30, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/30/2013. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lanx, Inc. v. Pioneer Surgical Technology, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Surgical Technology, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanx, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin L. Murphy
Represented By: David Benjamin Kellis
Represented By: John R. Posthumus
Represented By: Leigh Cameron Taggart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]