Ledford v. Envirotest Systems Corp.

Plaintiff: Rona Ledford
Defendant: Envirotest Systems, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01063
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 4/25/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/16/13. (rebsec, )
September 23, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/23/2013. (kmtcd)
December 27, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Notice of Settlement and Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice [# 17 ] is APPROVED. The combined Trial Preparation Conference and Final Pretrial Conference set 4/25/2014, and the trial by jury set to commence 5/12/2014, are VACATED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/27/2013. (klyon, )
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledford v. Envirotest Systems Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rona Ledford
Represented By: Scott Frederick Reese
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envirotest Systems, Corp.
Represented By: Natalia Solis Ballinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]