Claice v. Colo Doc. CSP.

Defendant: Colo Doc. CSP., C. Holditch, Nereson and Vangelder
Plaintiff: John A. Claice
Case Number: 1:2013cv01074
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/13/13. (nmmsl, )
June 20, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Drawe Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/20/13. Colo Doc. CSP. and C. Holditch (CSP., Major) terminated. (dkals, )
September 16, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and denying without prejudice in part 26 Motion to Reconsider Claim #3. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/16/2013.(klyon, )
October 11, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Amend Complaint and Memorandum/Response. The Clerk of the Court shall indicate on the docket that document # 33 is the Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [#28]. Defendants shall file a Reply on or before 10/28/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/11/2013.(klyon, )
December 12, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Amatangelis relieved of any further representation of Defendants in this case. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/12/2013.(klyon, )
February 28, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for Court Appointed Counseland Motions for Protection and denying 43 Motion for Colo. DOC to ProduceRecords at No Cost to the Plaintiff, Records Concerning or That Were a DirectResults [sic] of the Assault by Inmate Mike Anderson and Motion for AppointedCounsel. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/28/2014.(klyon, )
April 24, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/24/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claice v. Colo Doc. CSP.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colo Doc. CSP.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Holditch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nereson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vangelder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Claice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]