Small v. Young, et al

Defendant: Marc Chacon, Jeff Huddleston, Daniel Thompson and Melissa Yang
Plaintiff: Tyron Duante Small
Case Number: 1:2013cv01075
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/31/13. (nmmsl, )
October 31, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 35 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Pro Se Prisoner) Amended Complaint [# 25 ] is GRANTED. Defendant Young's Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint andJury Demand (Doc. No. 9) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) [# 26 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as barred bylimitations. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/31/2013.(klyon, )
October 31, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Daniel Thompson, Jeff Huddleston, Marc Chacon, Melissa Young against Tyron Duante Small re: 36 Order, by Clerk on 10/31/2013. (klyon, )
April 23, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/23/13. (nmmsl, )
May 8, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/08/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small v. Young, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Chacon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Huddleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Yang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyron Duante Small
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]