Weaver v. Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant: Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Brooking Weaver
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01078
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/18/13.(dkals, )
November 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Attorney's Fees by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/19/13.(dkals, )
May 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 6/24/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/24/13. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weaver v. Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Recovery Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooking Weaver
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]