Danes v. Denver Health and Hospital Authority

Plaintiff: Karla Danes
Defendant: Denver Health and Hospital Authority
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01083
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/16/2013.(ervsl, )
January 7, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Amend 9 Scheduling Order: to allow the depositions of Steven Thomas and Tania Gutierrez on January 24, 2014, and to allow the filing of dispositive motions by February 24, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/7/2014.(rpmcd )
May 1, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/1/2014. (jsmit )
May 13, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 6/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on June 19, 2014, and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/13/2014. (jsmit)
June 23, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 10/27/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/23/2014. (jsmit)
August 1, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resetting 26 Jury Trial for 12/8/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/1/2014. (jsmit)
May 21, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/9/2013 10:30 AM before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 3, 2013. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/21/2013. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Danes v. Denver Health and Hospital Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Danes
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Health and Hospital Authority
Represented By: Susan M. Stamm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]