Pohl et al v. U.S. Bank National Association

Plaintiff: Stanley M. Pohl, Zinaida Q. Pohl and Prince Song Cambilargiu
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2013cv01092
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 33 RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiffs' claims against All Persons or Entities Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in this Complaint Adverse to Plain tiffs Title, or Any Cloud upon Plaintiffs Title Thereto, and Does 1-20 are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and/or D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1 based upon plaintiffs' failure to prosecute and failure to serve these defendants. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/13/13.(mnfsl, )
December 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 35 Combined Motion for Stay of Discovery Order, and Request for Determination of Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion and Plaintiff's [sic] Opposition to Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/26/13.(mnfsl, )
January 10, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Combined Motion for Stay of Discovery Order, and Request for Determination of Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion and Plaintiff's [sic] Opposition to Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/10/14.(dkals, )
January 13, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/13/14.(mnfsl, )
May 6, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS Status Conference set for 6/6/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pohl et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley M. Pohl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zinaida Q. Pohl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Song Cambilargiu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: James N. Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]