Guinn v. Unnamed Contemplated Defendant(s)

Defendant: Unnamed Contemplated Defendant(s)
Plaintiff: Bill Guinn
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01093
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. ORDER denying as premature 1 Motion for Production of Documents, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/25/2013.(skl)
May 15, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, denied as premature 1 MOTION for Production of Documents; vacate 3 Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/15/2013. (skl)
June 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the Complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/19/13. (mjgsl, )
June 19, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 7 Order of Dismissal. (mjgsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guinn v. Unnamed Contemplated Defendant(s)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Contemplated Defendant(s)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Guinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]