Diaz v. Heil et al

Defendant: Margaret Heil and Anthony P. Young
Plaintiff: Jose A. Diaz
Case Number: 1:2013cv01098
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Dates in the "Order Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference". Scheduling Conference 7/8/2013 09:30 AM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/11/2013.(mjwcd)
February 24, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Defendants Amended Motion to Dismiss, and all of Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Each party shall bear his or her own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/24/2014.(evana, )
February 25, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Brandon Shaffer and Jill Lampela against Plaintiff Jose A. Diaz re: 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Deborah Hansen, Deputy Clerk on 2/25/2014. (wjmcd, )
April 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/26/2013. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Heil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony P. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Diaz
Represented By: John B. Roesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.