Phillips v. Duane Morris, LLP et al

Defendant: John C. Herman, Duane Morris, LLP and Allen L. Greenberg
Plaintiff: Edward H. Phillips
Case Number: 1:2013cv01105
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 110 Minute Entry for Jury Trial, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/14/2014. (klyon, )
December 12, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 136 RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendant's 127 Motion for Review of Clerk's Decision on Taxing of Costs is DENIED. Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Review of Clerk's Bill of Costs is DENI ED. The Clerk of the court is Directed to AMEND the 117 Bill of Costs filed 9/2/2014, to reduce the amount awarded for expert witness fees by $57,626.86 to $14, 585.66 and thus to tax costs in the total amount of $48,087.10 to plaintiff. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/12/2014. (alowe)
June 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/30/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) day Jury Trial set for 6/16/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/17/13. (rebsec, )
July 16, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion to Modify Paragraph 8(d) of the CivilScheduling Order. The Scheduling Order (Docket No. 22 ) is amended so as to modify the date in Paragraph 8(d) to be 8/19/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/16/2013.(klyon, )
August 20, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Second Joint Motion to Modify Paragraph 8(d) of the Civil Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order 22 is amended so as to modify the date in Paragraph 8(d) to be 9/16/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2013.(mjwcd)
November 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 33 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Paragraphs 9(d)(3) and (4) of the Civil Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 22 is amended as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/18/2-13.(mjwcd)
January 2, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Unopposed Motion to Modify Paragraphs 9(b), 9(c), 9(d)(3) and 9(d)(4) of the Civil Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/2/2014.(klyon, )
January 16, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order andTrial Preparation Conference Order. Scheduling Order 22 is amended as to expert disclosures. Trial Preparation Conference Order 21 is amended to extend deadline for Fed. R. Evid. 702 motions to 3/24/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/16/2014.(mjwcd)
February 21, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Unopposed Second Motion to Modify Paragraph 9(b) of the Civil Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/7/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/21/2014.(klyon, )
March 17, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Paragraph 8(c) of the Civil Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 17 is amended consistent with the minute order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/17/2014.(mjwcd)
March 20, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion to Modify Trial Preparation Conference Order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/20/2014.(klyon, )
May 19, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Disclosures of "Nonretained" Experts. Plaintiff's non-retained expert witnesses Franklin D. Patterson, Esquire, Plaintiff Edward H. Phillips, and Michael Shane Edgington shall be STRICKEN as non-retained expert witnesses. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/19/2014.(emill)
May 27, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The Joint Second Motion to Modify Certain Pretrial Deadlines [# 76 ] filed May 26, 2014, is GRANTED. The parties shall have until May 27, 2014, in which to submit proposed jury instructions, briefs relating to disputed jury instructions, proposed verdict forms, and a stipulated statement of claims and defenses. The Joint Motion to Modify Certain Pretrial Deadlines [# 71 ] filed May 15, 2014, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/27/2014.(klyon, )
April 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 6/17/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/25/2013. (klyon, )
May 28, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Juror Questionnaire. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Juror Questionnaire) (klyon, )
May 28, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 74 Objections to and Adopting 67 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [# 52 ], filed March 24, 2014, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/2014.(klyon, )
May 29, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 63 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert William A. Trine Under Fed.R.Evid.702. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/29/2014.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Duane Morris, LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Herman
Represented By: Carolyn J. Fairless
Represented By: Christopher P. Montville
Represented By: Michael L. O'Donnell
Represented By: James N. Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Morris, LLP
Represented By: Christopher P. Montville
Represented By: Carolyn J. Fairless
Represented By: Michael L. O'Donnell
Represented By: James N. Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen L. Greenberg
Represented By: Carolyn J. Fairless
Represented By: Christopher P. Montville
Represented By: Michael L. O'Donnell
Represented By: James N. Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward H. Phillips
Represented By: Shelley B. Don
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]