Sturgis v. Cummings et al

Defendant: Donald Chagnon, Craig Simpson, Brian Cummings, Richard Hallman and City of Colorado Springs
Plaintiff: John Sturgis
Case Number: 1:2013cv01109
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 8/7/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/22/2013. (klyon, )
August 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/16/13. (msksec, )
November 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/7/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 5/5/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/2013.(klyon, )
January 15, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The deadline to seek leave to amend is extended to and including December 4, 2013. The 29 Motion to Amend is granted, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the Second Amended Civil Rights Complaint [Doc. # 29-1]. In view of the Second Amended Complaint, the City of Colorado Springs' 13 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice as moot. The hearing on the Motion to Amend set for January 15, 2013, at 3:00 p.m., is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/15/14.(mnfsl, )
January 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Joint Motion for Stay. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/28/2014.(klyon, )
January 29, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/22/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2014. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/29/2014.(klyon, )
March 11, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Claims. Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice (Motion) (# 42 ) is granted. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants, Sergeant Brian Cummings, Richard Hallman, Detective Donald Chagnonand Sergeant Craig Simpson are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/11/2014.(klyon, )
May 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/01/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgis v. Cummings et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Chagnon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cummings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hallman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sturgis
Represented By: John R. Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]