Nsirat v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: Mohammed Nsirat
Case Number: 1:2013cv01114
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PRIVACY ACT PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/27/2013. (trlee, )
December 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 defendant's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference 12/9/2013 01:30 PM is vacated. Settlement Conference reset for 1/23/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Defendant shall submit its Confidential Settlement Statement on or before 1/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/3/2013.(mjwcd)
January 14, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 38 defendant's Unopposed Motion to VacateSettlement Conference. Settlement Conference 1/23/2014 01:30 PM vacated. Settlement Conference reset for 2/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to submit Defendant 's Confidential Settlement Statement and Plaintiff's Update 2/17/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/2014.(mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nsirat v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: May E. Kim
Represented By: William Aaron Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Nsirat
Represented By: Earl H. Staelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.