Jernigan v. Touchstone Health Partners

Defendant: Touchstone Health Partners and Cyndi Dodds
Plaintiff: Kristen N. Jernigan
Case Number: 1:2013cv01116
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order Resetting Scheduling Conference for 7/10/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/17/13. (sgrim)
October 2, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/2/13. (sgrim)
September 9, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 26 as to her First Claim for Relief is DENIED; Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 26 as to Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief is GRANTED and ju dgment shall enter in favor of Defendants on those claims at the conclusion of this action; As no claim remains pending against Defendant Cyndi Dodds, she is DISMISSED as a defendant and shall be removed from the caption in future filings; and This action remains pending as to Plaintiffs First Claim for Relief against Defendant Touchstone Health Partners, and shall proceed to trial as previously scheduled, commencing on June 29, 2015, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/9/2014.(evana, )
September 9, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 43 ORDER CONCLUSION: Granting ECF 27 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief and judgment shall enter in favor of Defendants on those claims at the conclusion of this action, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/9/2014.(evana, )
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jernigan v. Touchstone Health Partners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touchstone Health Partners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyndi Dodds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen N. Jernigan
Represented By: Nathan Davidovich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]